Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Fiyaz, Syeda Arooha, Fiyaz, Syeda Momina, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Husein Hadi, against Irshad, Hussain, represented by Valerie Sworn, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage Involving Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Motion (No Fee) Index # 10
Date: September 09, 2022Order Index # 12
Date: September 13, 2022No Fee Documents Index # 11
Date: September 09, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Address Minor Plaintiff Turning of Age Order Index # 12 Order Index # 12Order Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Address Minor Plaintiff Turning of Age |
|
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Address Minor Plaintiff Turning of Age Motion (No Fee) Index # 10 Motion (No Fee) Index # 10Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Address Minor Plaintiff Turning of Age |
|
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Verification No Fee Documents Index # 11 No Fee Documents Index # 11Verification |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem Order Appointing Index # 9 Order Appointing Index # 9Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem |
|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem Motion (No Fee) Index # 8 Motion (No Fee) Index # 8Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem |
|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order on Nonsuit Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other Index # 7 Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other Index # 7Order on Nonsuit |
|
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit Motion (No Fee) Index # 6 Motion (No Fee) Index # 6Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit |
|
December 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 5 Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 5Defendant's Original Answer |
|
December 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Fee PaidFee Paid by Defendant | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Return for Hussain Irshad Served on 12/3/2021 Officers Return Index # 4 Officers Return Index # 4Citation Return for Hussain Irshad Served on 12/3/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.