Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Donald D. Degrasse, against Yates, Jeffrey, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other Index # 6
Date: November 09, 2021Motion (No Fee) Index # 5
Date: November 08, 2021Notice Index # 4
Date: November 01, 2021Issuance Index # 3
Date: September 03, 2021Request Index # 2
Date: September 02, 2021Petition Index # 1
Date: September 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other Index # 6 Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other Index # 6Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice |
|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice Motion (No Fee) Index # 5 Motion (No Fee) Index # 5Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Plaintiff's Affidavit and/or Other Trial Related Documents Notice Index # 4 Notice Index # 4Notice of Filing of Plaintiff's Affidavit and/or Other Trial Related Documents |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Citatione-ServiceYates, Jeffrey Unserved | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation - Jeffrey Yates Issuance Index # 3 Issuance Index # 3Citation Issued to Jeffrey Yates |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Process Request Request Index # 2 Request Index # 2Civil Process Request |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition Petition Index # 1 Petition Index # 1Plaintiff's Original Petition |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Request Index # 2Civil Process Request | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition Index # 1Plaintiff's Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.