Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Blomstorm, David B, Blomstorm, Eugenia M, Blomstrom, Eugenia M, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by John Wesley Wauson, against Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., represented by Vi T Tran, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 7
Date: March 22, 2021Motion (No Fee) Index # 8
Date: March 22, 2021Amended Filing Index # 6
Date: March 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order for Nonsuit Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other Index # 10 Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other Index # 10Order for Nonsuit |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Nonsuit Motion (No Fee) Index # 9 Motion (No Fee) Index # 9Notice of Nonsuit |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Original Petition Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 7 Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 7Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Original Petition |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Motion (No Fee) Index # 8 Motion (No Fee) Index # 8Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's First Amended Original Petition Amended Filing Index # 6 Amended Filing Index # 6Plaintiff's First Amended Original Petition |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement No Fee Documents Index # 5 No Fee Documents Index # 5Rule 11 Agreement |
|
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Return for Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc. Served 01-27-21 Officers Return Index # 4 Officers Return Index # 4Citation Return for Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc. Served 01-27-21 |
|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation - Marriott Ownership Resorts Inc. Issuance Index # 3 Issuance Index # 3Citation Issued to Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc. |
|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | CitationE-serviceMarriott Ownership Resorts, Inc.Served01/27/2021Returned02/11/2021 | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Process Request Index # 2 Request Index # 2Request for Process |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.