Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Forsythe Finance, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jody D Jenkins, against Pryor, Kniesha Chavonn, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other Index # 7
Date: December 03, 2021Officers Return Index # 6
Date: November 30, 2021Motion (No Fee) Index # 4
Date: November 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other Index # 7 Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other Index # 7Order (Motion for Nonsuit) |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Return for Kniesha Chavonn Pryor Unserved Officers Return Index # 6 Officers Return Index # 6Citation Return for Kniesha Chavonn Pryor Unserved |
|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Nonsuit Motion (No Fee) Index # 4 Motion (No Fee) Index # 4Motion for Nonsuit |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Process Request Request Index # 2 Request Index # 2Civil Process Request |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation - Kniesha Chavonn Pryor Issuance Index # 3 Issuance Index # 3Citation Issued to Kniesha Chavonn Pryor |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition Petition Index # 1 Petition Index # 1Plaintiff's Original Petition |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CitationEservicePryor, Kniesha Chavonn Returned Unserved 11/30/2021Returned11/30/2021 | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CitationEservicePryor, Kniesha Chavonn Unserved | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Issuance Index # 3Citation Issued to Kniesha Chavonn Pryor | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Process Request Request Index # 2Civil Process Request |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.