Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Townewest Homeowners Association, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lewis W. "Chip" Smith, Iv, against Mcinnis, Kevin D., in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts with Stuti Trehan Patel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStuti Trehan Patel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 11
Date: July 20, 2022Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 10
Date: July 20, 2022Dismissed for Want of Prosecution Index # 9
Date: July 12, 2022DWOP Notice Sent
Date: May 26, 2022Proposed Order Index # 8
Date: May 16, 2022Letters
Date: May 16, 2022No Fee Documents Index # 6
Date: May 16, 2022No Fee Documents Index # 7
Date: May 16, 2022Notice Index # 5
Date: May 16, 2022Officers Return Index # 3
Date: March 10, 2021Issuance Index # 2
Date: January 15, 2021Motion (No Fee) Index # 4
Date: May 16, 2022Letters
Date: January 13, 2021Petition Index # 1
Date: January 13, 2021Petition      Index # 1
Date: January 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 NEW Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 11 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 11 |
|
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 NEW Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 10 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Index # 10 |
|
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
240th DWOP Order Dismissed for Want of Prosecution Index # 9 Dismissed for Want of Prosecution Index # 9Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution |
|
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | DWOP Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Patel, Stuti) | |
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Submission Docket (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Fraley, Frank J) | |
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
240th DWOP Notice DWOP Notice Sent |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion to Retain Proposed Order Index # 8 Proposed Order Index # 8Order Granting Motion to Retain |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Filing Letter LettersFiling Letter |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service No Fee Documents Index # 6 No Fee Documents Index # 6Certificate of Service |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Verification No Fee Documents Index # 7 No Fee Documents Index # 7Verification |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.