Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Diana E. Stevens filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Hernandez, Guadalupe, Hernandez, Francisco Esteban, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2006 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2007 | Docket Event | Remarks Index # 999Legacy Event Type: CASE MICROFILMED Document Text: CASE JACKET DESTROYED: MAY 9, 2007 CASE MAY BE VIEWED ON MICROFILM: REEL:# CV-2006-0159 BLIP:# 0632 - 0677 EventTime = 08:43:12 Filing Party: , | |
December 19, 2006 | Docket Event | Copy Index # 999Legacy Event Type: COPIES MADE Document Text: ONE COPY OF THE APPLICANT NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT MAILED TO MANN & STEVENS 12-01-06 DCHC164342 2.00 CS DONE BY SHANNA EventTime = 13:21:57 Filing Party: , | |
November 30, 2006 | Docket Event | Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 239A Index # 999Legacy Event Type: JUDGMENT NTC MLD/RULE 239a Document Text: Docket entry for the NOTICE produced from CDADOCT on 30-NOV-2006 by PERHAMAR. IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEXAS RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE NOTICES WERE MAILED TO ALL PARTIES OR ATTORNEYS BEING DEFAULTED EventTime = 15:52:05 Filing Party: , | |
November 22, 2006 | Docket Event | Default Judgment Index # 999Legacy Event Type: DEFAULT JUDGMENT/FINAL Document Text: ORDER GRANTING APPLICANT'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ORDER WITHOUT HEARING UNDER TCRP 736(5) 2 PAGES EventTime = 11:20:00 Filing Party: WELLS FARGO BANK N A AS ATRUSTEE UNDER THE POOLING & SERVICI, | |
November 06, 2006 | Docket Event | Affidavit Index # 999Legacy Event Type: AFFIDAVIT FILED Document Text: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AND CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS BRIAN G. CANO AFFIANT WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE EventTime = 14:28:00 Filing Party: , | |
November 06, 2006 | Docket Event | Motion (No Fee) Index # 999Legacy Event Type: MOTION FILED Document Text: FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ORDER WITHOUT HEARING UNDER TCRP 736 (5) WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE EventTime = 14:29:00 Filing Party: WELLS FARGO BANK N A AS ATRUSTEE UNDER THE POOLING & SERVICI, | |
November 06, 2006 | Docket Event | Remarks Index # 999Legacy Event Type: PAYMENT RECEIVED Document Text: A Payment of -$2.00 was made on receipt DCHC164342. EventTime = 15:06:07 Filing Party: , | |
September 26, 2006 | Docket Event | Remarks Index # 999Legacy Event Type: COURT'S DOCKET SHEET GENERATED Document Text: Docket entry for the DOCKET SHEET produced from CDADOCT on 26-SEP-2006 by HARGRTER. EventTime = 09:54:38 Filing Party: , | |
September 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Remarks Index # 999Legacy Event Type: PAYMENT RECEIVED Document Text: A Payment of -$222.00 was made on receipt DCHC158735. EventTime = 08:39:28 Filing Party: STEVENS, DIANA E. | |
September 15, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice Index # 999Legacy Event Type: NOTICE FILED Document Text: NOTICE TO: FRANCISCO ESTEBAN HERNANDEZ GUADALUPE HERNANDEZ 5814 MELANTIE STREET HOUSTON, TX 77053 WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE EventTime = 14:50:00 Filing Party: STEVENS, DIANA E. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.