Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Gecu, filed a(n) Deceptive Trade Practices - Consumer case represented by Chris Blalack, against Aguilar, Brian Alberto, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2022 |
CategoryDeceptive Trade Practices |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaConsumer |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDeceptive Trade Practices |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
AbstractAguilar, Brian Alberto Unserved
Judge: Dominguez, Francisco X. |
|
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request Index # 6
Judge: Dominguez, Francisco X. |
|
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Dominguez, Francisco X. |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letter Index # 4
Judge: Dominguez, Francisco X. |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Index # 5
Judge: Dominguez, Francisco X. |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
CitationAguilar, Brian AlbertoServed10/29/2022Response Due11/21/2022Returned10/31/2022
Judge: Dominguez, Francisco X. |
|
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request Index # 2
Judge: Dominguez, Francisco X. |
|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Index # 1
Judge: Dominguez, Francisco X. |
|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
E-File Event Original Filing
Judge: Dominguez, Francisco X. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.