Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Gecu, filed a(n) Deceptive Trade Practices - Consumer case represented by Chris Blalack, against Favela, Irma Y., in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2022 |
CategoryDeceptive Trade Practices |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaConsumer |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDeceptive Trade Practices |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Letter Index # 6 | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Default Judgment Index # 7 | |
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Substitute Service Index # 4 | |
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Substitute Service Index # 3 | |
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | CitationFavela, Irma Y.Served01/18/2023Response Due02/13/2023Returned01/18/2023 | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Request Index # 2 | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | E-File Event Original Filing | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) Index # 1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.