Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Mobile Home Supply, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mannie Kalman, against Oquendo, Clarivel, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2022 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeNonsuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Baeza, Melissa)
Judge: Baeza, Melissa |
|
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Hearing Index # 9
Judge: Baeza, Melissa |
|
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Index # 7
Judge: Baeza, Melissa |
|
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Hearing Index # 8
Judge: Baeza, Melissa |
|
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dismiss Want of Prosecution (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Baeza, Melissa)
Judge: Baeza, Melissa |
|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Index # 4
Judge: Baeza, Melissa |
|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status/Scheduling Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Baeza, Melissa)
Judge: Baeza, Melissa |
|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Hearing Index # 5
Judge: Baeza, Melissa |
|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Hearing Index # 6
Judge: Baeza, Melissa |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Index # 3
Judge: Baeza, Melissa |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.