Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Spraglin, Darren, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Tad Rice, against 9960 Mccombs, Llc, Defendant 9960 Mccombs, Llc D B A Parkland Pointe Apartment Homes, Fpi Management, Inc., represented by David L. Pacione, Maria E. Orozco, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2022 |
CategoryOther Injury Or Damage |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Change in Firm Affiliation or Address Index # 29 | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Deposition Index # 28 | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Permitting Withdrawl of Counsel Index # 27 | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Withdraw Index # 26 | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Take Oral Deposition Index # 25 | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | DC - Counter Petition/Cross Action/Counter Claim | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Index # 23 | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer Index # 22 | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Take Deposition by Written Questions Index # 19 | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Take Deposition by Written Questions Index # 18 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.