Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Viva-Chaparral Properties, Llp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Michael J Shane, against Sauls, Sara, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2022 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Baca, Patricia C. |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Default Hearing (9:45 AM) (Judicial Officer Baca, Patricia C.) 12/07/2022Reset by Court to 02/22/2023 Result: Granted
Judge: Baca, Patricia C. |
|
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Index # 11
Judge: Baca, Patricia C. |
|
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Return Receipt Index # 10
Judge: Baca, Patricia C. |
|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Index # 9
Judge: Baca, Patricia C. |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Return Receipt Index # 8
Judge: Baca, Patricia C. |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Index # 7
Judge: Baca, Patricia C. |
|
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Index # 6
Judge: Baca, Patricia C. |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Address Index # 4
Judge: Baca, Patricia C. |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Index # 5
Judge: Baca, Patricia C. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.