Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Joseph Chase Lincer, against Aldama, Jorge, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Alyssa G. Perez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlyssa G. Perez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 07, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeOrder For Non-Suit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Suit Index # 7
Judge: Perez, Alyssa |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Index # 6
Judge: Perez, Alyssa |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Index # 4
Judge: Perez, Alyssa |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Suit Index # 5
Judge: Perez, Alyssa |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
CitationAldama, Jorge Returned Unserved 06/25/2021Returned06/25/2021
Judge: Perez, Alyssa |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | CitationAldama, Jorge Unserved | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-File Event Original Filing
Judge: Perez, Alyssa |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request Index # 2
Judge: Perez, Alyssa |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Index # 1
Judge: Perez, Alyssa |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Request Index # 2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.