Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Evolve Fedeal Credit Union, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lane C Reedman, against Gomez, Ismael E., Martinez, Rosa J., in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 06, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Dominguez, Francisco X. |
|
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Address Index # 7
Judge: Dominguez, Francisco X. |
|
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Address Index # 6
Judge: Dominguez, Francisco X. |
|
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Index # 5
Judge: Dominguez, Francisco X. |
|
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Index # 4
Judge: Dominguez, Francisco X. |
|
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Other Pleading Index # 2 | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
CitationMartinez, Rosa J.Served05/15/2021Response Due06/07/2021Returned05/24/2021Gomez, Ismael E.Served11/06/2021Response Due11/28/2022Returned02/16/2022
Judge: Dominguez, Francisco X. |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | CitationMartinez, Rosa J. Unserved Gomez, Ismael E. Unserved | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-File Event Original Filing
Judge: Dominguez, Francisco X. |
|
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Index # 1
Judge: Dominguez, Francisco X. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.