Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lomeli & Sons Landscaping Company, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mannie Kalman, against Spartan Construction Of Texas, represented by Colbert Nathaniel Coldwell, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 05, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing CANCELED Status Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Solis, Selena) Dismissed Judge: Solis, Selena |
|
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Solis, Selena |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Index # 10
Judge: Solis, Selena |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Solis, Selena) Result: Set for Status Hearing
Judge: Solis, Selena |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Index # 9
Judge: Solis, Selena |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
DC - Counter Petition/Cross Action/Counter Claim
Judge: Solis, Selena |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer Index # 8
Judge: Solis, Selena |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Index # 7
Judge: Solis, Selena |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Solis, Selena) Result: Set for Hearing
Judge: Solis, Selena |
|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Index # 5
Judge: Solis, Selena |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.