Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Benjamin Joseph Gutierrez, Colin Patrick Brogan, against Rodriguez, Victor, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 05, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeOrder For Non-Suit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Designation of Attorney in Charge Index # 8
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
DWOP Hearing (9:45 AM) (Judicial Officer Chew, Linda)
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Retain Index # 7
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Hearing Index # 6
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Hearing Index # 5
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution Index # 4
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
CitationRodriguez, Victor Returned Unserved 06/24/2021Returned06/24/2021
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CitationRodriguez, Victor Unserved | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Index # 1
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request Index # 2
Judge: Chew, Linda |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.