Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Colin Patrick Brogan, against Talamantes, Stephan, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 05, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing CANCELED Status Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Chew, Linda) Court Coordinator Discretionary Cancellation Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Default Judgment Index # 10
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Index # 9
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Retain Index # 8
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
DWOP Hearing (9:45 AM) (Judicial Officer Chew, Linda)
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Retain Index # 7
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Index # 6
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Index # 4
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Index # 5
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Other Pleading Index # 3 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.