Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ramos, Jose, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Alejandro Acosta, Iii, Daisy Chaparro, against Castillo, Manuel M, Jr., represented by Clifford R Jessup, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 04, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance Index # 17 | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Permitting Withdrawl of Counsel Index # 16 | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Withdraw Index # 15 | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Designation of Attorney in Charge Index # 14 | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Written Discovery Index # 13 | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Written Discovery Index # 12 | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Service Index # 11 | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Written Discovery Index # 10 | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Written Discovery Index # 9 | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Service Index # 8 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.