Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Loera, Ricardo, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by John P Valdez, against Xpo Enterprise Services, Llc, Xpo Logistics Freight, Inc., represented by Paul E. Hash, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 28, 2021 |
CategoryWrongful Termination |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Order |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Index # 9
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer Index # 7
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer Index # 8
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request Index # 3
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
CitationXPO Enterprise Services, LLCServed05/06/2021Response Received05/25/2021Returned05/10/2021XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.Served05/06/2021Response Received05/25/2021Returned05/10/2021
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CitationXPO Enterprise Services, LLCServed05/06/2021Response Due05/31/2021Returned05/10/2021XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.Served05/06/2021Response Due05/31/2021Returned05/10/2021 | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Request Index # 3 | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Request Doc ID# 3 | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-File Event Original Filing
Judge: Chew, Linda |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.