Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lomas 500, Llc, filed a(n) Property Appraisal Appeal case represented by Harrel L Davis, Iii, against El Paso Central Appraisal District, represented by Joseph T Longoria, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2020 |
CategoryProperty Appraisal Appeal |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Hearing (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Chew, Linda) 10/26/2020Reset by Court to 11/02/2020 | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Written Discovery Doc ID# 7 | |
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 6 | |
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel Doc ID# 5 | |
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer Doc ID# 4 | |
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event | CitationEl Paso Central Appraisal DistrictServed09/09/2020Response Received09/24/2020Returned09/11/2020 | |
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | E-File Event Original Filing | |
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) Doc ID# 1 | |
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Request Doc ID# 2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.