Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ramirez, Veronica, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Trejo, Robert, Jr., in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 12, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Court Status Check (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Pelletier, Karen A.) | |
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Court Status Check (7:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Herrera, Mike) | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Referral Order Doc ID# 5 (Judicial Officer: Herrera, Mike ) | |
October 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Court Status Check (8:42 AM) (Judicial Officer Herrera, Mike) | |
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event | CitationTREJO, ROBERT, Jr. Unserved | |
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Request Doc ID# 4 | |
October 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Screening Instrument Doc ID# 2 | |
October 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Doc ID# 3 | |
October 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition for Divorce Doc ID# 1 | |
October 12, 2020 | Docket Event | E-File Event Original Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.