Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Donald D Degrasse, against Mora Gallegos, Juan Manue, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Barill, Angie Juarez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarill, Angie Juarez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDismissal Without Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Dismiss Want of Prosecution CANCELED Dismiss Want of Prosecution (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Barill, Angie Juarez) Dismissed Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
|
November 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution Doc ID# 10
Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
|
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
|
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Doc ID# 9
Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
|
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Doc ID# 8
Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
|
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Hearing Doc ID# 7
Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
|
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Hearing Doc ID# 6
Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
|
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution Doc ID# 5
Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
|
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Substitute Service Doc ID# 4
Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
|
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Letter Doc ID# 3
Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.