Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
El Paso Area Teachers Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Angelica Carreon-Beltran, against Munoz, Kenneth Luis, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Salas-Mendoza, Maria presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSalas-Mendoza, Maria Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2018 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Salas-Mendoza, Maria |
|
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Doc ID# 6
Judge: Salas-Mendoza, Maria |
|
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order for Substitute Service Doc ID# 4
Judge: Salas-Mendoza, Maria |
|
February 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Substitute Service Doc ID# 3
Judge: Salas-Mendoza, Maria |
|
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
CitationMunoz, Kenneth LuisServed02/23/2019Response Due03/18/2019Returned02/25/2019
Judge: Salas-Mendoza, Maria |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
E-File Event Original Filing
Judge: Salas-Mendoza, Maria |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Doc ID# 1
Judge: Salas-Mendoza, Maria |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 2
Judge: Salas-Mendoza, Maria |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.