Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
U.S. Bank National Association,, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Lauren Christoffel, against Almaguer, Juana Maria Mata, Juarez, Christopher, Juarez, Maria Elisa, Montanez, Antonio Juarez, Montanez, Tina Juarez, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Spieczny, Tom presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSpieczny, Tom Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2018 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeNonsuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Morales, Ruben)
Judge: Spieczny, Tom |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Doc ID# 21
Judge: Spieczny, Tom |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing (11:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Morales, Ruben) Result: Reset
Judge: Spieczny, Tom |
|
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Setting
Judge: Spieczny, Tom |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing CANCELED Status Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Morales, Ruben) Other Judge: Spieczny, Tom |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Morales, Ruben)
Judge: Morales, Ruben |
|
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing CANCELED Status Hearing (11:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Morales, Ruben) Reset Judge: Spieczny, Tom |
|
March 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Setting
Judge: Spieczny, Tom |
|
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Morales, Ruben) Result: Reset
Judge: Spieczny, Tom |
|
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Setting
Judge: Spieczny, Tom |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.