Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Aspeitia, Andres filed a(n) Licensing - Administrative case in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Alvarez, Javier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlvarez, Javier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2018 |
CategoryOccupational Driver'S License |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeLicensing |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Dismiss Want of Prosecution (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Alvarez, Javier)
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Hearing Doc ID# 5
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
September 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Hearing Doc ID# 3
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
September 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent Dismiss Doc ID# 4
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 2
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Doc ID# 1
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
E-File Event Original Filing
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.