Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lvnv Funding, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Megan Hale, against Chagra, Tina, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Kurita, M. Sue presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKurita, M. Sue Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2018 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Default Judgment Doc ID# 7
Judge: Kurita, M. Sue |
|
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Status/Scheduling Conference (1:30 PM) () Result: Default Judgment
Judge: Kurita, M. Sue |
|
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Doc ID# 6
Judge: Kurita, M. Sue |
|
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 5
Judge: Kurita, M. Sue |
|
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
CitationCHAGRA, TINAServed01/16/2019Returned01/17/2019
Judge: Kurita, M. Sue |
|
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request Doc ID# 3
Judge: Kurita, M. Sue |
|
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
E-File Event Original Filing
Judge: Kurita, M. Sue |
|
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request Doc ID# 2
Judge: Kurita, M. Sue |
|
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Doc ID# 1
Judge: Kurita, M. Sue |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.