Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ditech Financial Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jeffry B. Lewis, against Hernandez, Guadalupe, Hernandez, Guillermo, Occupant Of The Property, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Chew, Linda presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChew, Linda Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 27, 2018 |
CategoryOther Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeOrder For Non-Suit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing CANCELED Status Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Chew, Linda) Non-Suit12/02/2019Reset by Court to 06/01/2020 Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
April 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Lifting Stay Doc ID# 10
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Non Suit Doc ID# 9
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
December 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 8
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 7
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing (9:45 AM) (Judicial Officer Chew, Linda)
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request Doc ID# 6
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 5
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
November 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Suggestion of Bankruptcy (OCA) Doc ID# 4
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
CitationHERNANDEZ, GUILLERMO Unserved HERNANDEZ, GUADALUPE Unserved
Judge: Chew, Linda |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.