Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Malaterre, Jeremy Scott, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Visser, Andrea Denise, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Leverton, Reed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeverton, Reed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2018 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Order |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order Doc ID# 7 (Judicial Officer: Leverton, Reed )
Judge: : Leverton, Reed |
|
May 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Uncontested Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Leverton, Reed) Result: Passed
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
May 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Deposition of Written Questions Doc ID# 6
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
January 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Referral Order Doc ID# 5 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: : Strathmann, Laura |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
E-File Event Original Filing
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Petition for Divorce Doc ID# 1
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Screening Instrument Doc ID# 4
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 3
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.