Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Office Of The Attorney General, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Rodriguez, Antonio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRodriguez, Antonio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2018 |
CategoryTitle Iv-D Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Antonio)
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
CitationARAUZ, ANTHONY GENARO Unserved
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
CitationARAUZ, ANTHONY GENARO Unserved
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Paternity Hearing (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Antonio)
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 6 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Antonio)
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 5 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service Doc ID# 4
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
CitationARAUZ, ANTHONY GENARO Unserved
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 3 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Antonio |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.