Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Office Of The Attorney General, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Rodriguez, Antonio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRodriguez, Antonio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2018 |
CategoryTitle Iv-D Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2019 | Docket Event | FRD-FEE-CIV | |
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Paternity Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Antonio)
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of Last Address Doc ID# 6 | |
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Default Judgment | |
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Default Judgment Doc ID# 7 | |
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Evaluation Filed Doc ID# 5 | |
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order for Paternity Test Doc ID# 4 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Antonio)
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event | CitationFLOYD, PRESTON LEERAYServed02/26/2019Response Due03/25/2019Returned03/07/2019 | |
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 3 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Antonio |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.