Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Baquera, Francisco Victor filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Baquera, Susana, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzalez, Jose M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGonzalez, Jose M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2018 |
CategoryProtective Orders |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeOrder For Non-Suit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order for Non-Suit Doc ID# 9 (Judicial Officer: Gonzalez, Jose M )
Judge: : Gonzalez, Jose M |
|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Suit Doc ID# 8
Judge: Gonzalez, Jose M |
|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Protective Order Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Gonzalez, Jose M)
Judge: Gonzalez, Jose M |
|
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Hearing Request Form Doc ID# 6 (Judicial Officer: Gonzalez, Jose M )
Judge: : Gonzalez, Jose M |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Application Doc ID# 4
Judge: Gonzalez, Jose M |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Hearing (1:25 PM) (Judicial Officer Gonzalez, Jose M)
Judge: Gonzalez, Jose M |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Order Doc ID# 5
Judge: Gonzalez, Jose M |
|
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
DC - Counter Petition/Cross Action/Counter Claim
Judge: Gonzalez, Jose M |
|
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
E-File Event Original Filing
Judge: Gonzalez, Jose M |
|
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Screening Instrument Doc ID# 2
Judge: Gonzalez, Jose M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.