Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jo Anne Bernal filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Corona, Alejandro, Jr., in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with : Pelletier, Karen A. presiding.
Case Number |
Judge: Pelletier, Karen A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2018 |
CategoryProtective Orders |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event | FRD-FEE-CIV | |
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Copy Doc ID# 7 | |
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Information Sheet Doc ID# 6 | |
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Protective Order Hearing (1:15 PM) (Judicial Officer Pelletier, Karen A.) Result: Agreed
Judge: Pelletier, Karen A. |
|
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice to Show CauseCORONA, ALEJANDRO, Jr.Served01/05/2019Returned01/09/2019 | |
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Status Check (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Pelletier, Karen A.)
Judge: Pelletier, Karen A. |
|
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (OCA) Doc ID# 4 (Judicial Officer: Pelletier, Karen A. )
Judge: : Pelletier, Karen A. |
|
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 2 | |
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event | E-File Event Original Filing | |
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Screening Instrument Doc ID# 3 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.