Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Diaz, Frank, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Daniela Labinoti, against J.A.R. Concrete, Inc., represented by Janet Belcher Martin, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Enriquez, Sergio H. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEnriquez, Sergio H. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryOther Injury Or Damage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeNotice Of Non-Suit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment Hearing CANCELED Entry of Judgment Hearing (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Enriquez, Sergio H.) Non-Suit Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
June 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 27
Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
November 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Use Doc ID# 26
Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
November 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Use Doc ID# 25
Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
November 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Use Doc ID# 23
Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
November 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Use Doc ID# 24
Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
November 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Use Doc ID# 22
Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
October 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Enriquez, Sergio H.) Cancelled Pending Reset Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
October 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Final Pre-Trial Hearing CANCELED Final Pre-Trial Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Enriquez, Sergio H.) Cancelled Pending Reset Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.