Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Autovest, L.L.C., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Johnetta Lang, against Maldonado, Sergio, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Villa, Carlos presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVilla, Carlos Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
|
January 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Villa, Carlos)
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
|
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution Doc ID# 7
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
|
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order to Retain Doc ID# 5
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
|
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Villa, Carlos)
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
|
October 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution Doc ID# 6
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
|
September 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion to Retain Doc ID# 4
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
|
July 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution Doc ID# 3
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
|
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Doc ID# 1
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
|
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 2
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.