Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
American Express Centurion Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Donald D Degrasse, against Christopher, Sandra K., in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Garcia, Patrick M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGarcia, Patrick M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
March 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Other Pleading Doc ID# 5
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Doc ID# 4
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change Doc ID# 3
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
January 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
CitationCHRISTOPHER, SANDRA K. Unserved
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
E-File Event Original Filing
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 2
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Doc ID# 1
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.