Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gutierrez, Ruben, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gutierrez, Marisela, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Rodriguez, Jesus presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRodriguez, Jesus Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Jesus) 02/24/2016Reset by Court to 03/09/201603/09/2016Reset by Court to 03/16/201603/16/2016Reset by Court to 03/23/201603/23/2016Reset by Court to 03/30/201603/30/2016Reset by Court to 04/06/2016 Result: Submitted
Judge: Rodriguez, Jesus |
|
April 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Hearing Request Form Doc ID# 15 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Jesus |
|
April 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Decree of Divorce Doc ID# 14 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Jesus |
|
March 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Hearing Request Form Doc ID# 13 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Jesus |
|
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Hearing Request Form Doc ID# 12 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Jesus |
|
March 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Resetting Hearing Doc ID# 11 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Jesus |
|
February 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Certificate of Completion Doc ID# 10 | |
February 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Referral Order Doc ID# 9 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: : Strathmann, Laura |
|
February 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Jesus) Result: Agreed
Judge: Rodriguez, Jesus |
|
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Amended Petition Doc ID# 8 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.