Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Perez, Luis, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Sierra, Naomi, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Strathmann, Laura presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStrathmann, Laura Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
CategoryParent Child - Non-Divorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial CANCELED Jury Trial (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Strathmann, Laura) Agreed Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
|
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Hearing CANCELED Pre-Trial Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Strathmann, Laura) Settled Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
|
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Strathmann, Laura) 11/03/2017Reset by Court to 12/01/201712/01/2017Reset by Court to 12/08/2017
Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
|
December 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Hearing Request Form Doc ID# 41 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: : Strathmann, Laura |
|
November 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Permitting Withdrawl of Counsel Doc ID# 40 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: : Strathmann, Laura |
|
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Setting Hearing Doc ID# 39 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: : Strathmann, Laura |
|
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Hearing Request Form Doc ID# 38 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: : Strathmann, Laura |
|
October 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Hearing Request Form Doc ID# 37 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: : Strathmann, Laura |
|
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (3:15 PM) (Judicial Officer Strathmann, Laura)
Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
|
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Findings and Rulings |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.