Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Office Of The Attorney General, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Herrera, Mike presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHerrera, Mike Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
CategoryTitle Iv-D Parent Child |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Order |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
DWOP Hearing (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Pelletier, Karen A.) Result: Dismissed
Judge: Herrera, Mike |
|
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution Doc ID# 15 (Judicial Officer: Pelletier, Karen A. )
Judge: Herrera, Mike |
|
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service Doc ID# 14
Judge: Herrera, Mike |
|
June 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Report to the Court Doc ID# 13
Judge: Herrera, Mike |
|
February 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Completion Doc ID# 12
Judge: Herrera, Mike |
|
December 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order Doc ID# 11 (Judicial Officer: Herrera, Mike )
Judge: Herrera, Mike |
|
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order for Access Facilitation
Judge: Herrera, Mike |
|
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Herrera, Mike) 10/23/2015Reset by Court to 11/20/2015
Judge: Herrera, Mike |
|
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Temporary Order Doc ID# 10 (Judicial Officer: Herrera, Mike )
Judge: Herrera, Mike |
|
October 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Setting Hearing Doc ID# 9 (Judicial Officer: Herrera, Mike )
Judge: Herrera, Mike |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.