Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rodriguez, Irma A, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hernandez Silva, Luis Eduardo, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Leverton, Reed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeverton, Reed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDivorce Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Uncontested Hearing (7:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Jesus) Result: Granted
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
January 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Divorce Hearing (8:15 AM) (Judicial Officer Strathmann, Laura) Result: Appeared
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Dismiss Want of Prosecution (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Strathmann, Laura)
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution Doc ID# 8 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Setting Hearing Doc ID# 9 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Dismiss Want of Prosecution (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Strathmann, Laura) Result: Set for Hearing
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
November 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
CitationHERNANDEZ SILVA, LUIS EDUARDOServed12/02/2015Response Due12/28/2015Returned12/04/2015
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
October 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent Dismiss Doc ID# 7 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Referral Order Doc ID# 6 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice to All Parties Filing Pro Se Doc ID# 4
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.