Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Office Of The Attorney General, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Rodriguez, Antonio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRodriguez, Antonio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2014 |
CategoryTitle Iv-D Parent Child |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeDismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Doc ID# 13 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
November 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Antonio)
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Modification Hearing (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Antonio)
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 12 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
CitationGADDY, ANTHONY KEE Returned Unserved 09/28/2018Returned09/28/2018
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Antonio)
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 11 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service Doc ID# 10
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
CitationGADDY, ANTHONY KEE Unserved
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
June 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 9
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.