Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Scheid, Richard Ii, Scheid, Christian, Clark, Cathy, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Humberto S Enriquez, against Haggerty & Co. Inc., A+ Integrity General Contracting, Llc, represented by J Monty Stevens, William Elias, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Villa, Carlos presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVilla, Carlos Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2011 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other Professional Malpractice |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Case Outcome TypeDismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
|
November 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment Hearing CANCELED Entry of Judgment Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Villa, Carlos) Dismissed Judge: Villa, Carlos |
|
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Doc ID# 73
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
|
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Doc ID# 72
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
|
September 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 71
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
|
August 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Villa, Carlos)
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Villa, Carlos)
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
|
August 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition Doc ID# 69
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
|
August 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Mediation Report Doc ID# 68
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
|
August 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Villa, Carlos)
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.