Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Security Service Credit Union, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Steve Raney, against Morales, Maria E., Morales, Alfonso, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Villa, Carlos presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVilla, Carlos Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 12, 2011 |
CategoryForeclosure |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
|
August 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
DWOP Hearing (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Villa, Carlos)
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
|
August 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent Dismiss Doc ID# 3
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
|
December 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service Doc ID# 2
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
|
December 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Doc ID# 1
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.