Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Valtierra, Guadalupe, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Richard Zamora, against United Services Automobile Association, Castillo, Stacey, represented by Robert E Valdez, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Rangel, Bonnie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRangel, Bonnie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 12, 2011 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeDismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Rangel, Bonnie |
|
June 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
DWOP Hearing (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Rangel, Bonnie)
Judge: Rangel, Bonnie |
|
May 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Doc ID# 10
Judge: Rangel, Bonnie |
|
May 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Hearing Doc ID# 9
Judge: Rangel, Bonnie |
|
May 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Hearing Doc ID# 8
Judge: Rangel, Bonnie |
|
April 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Fax Doc ID# 6
Judge: Rangel, Bonnie |
|
April 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution Doc ID# 7
Judge: Rangel, Bonnie |
|
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition Doc ID# 5
Judge: Rangel, Bonnie |
|
January 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Answer Doc ID# 3
Judge: Rangel, Bonnie |
|
January 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Answer Doc ID# 4
Judge: Rangel, Bonnie |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.