Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Garfio, Esmeralda, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Daniel Mena, against Lloyds Of London Insurance, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Alvarez, Javier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlvarez, Javier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 12, 2011 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
May 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
DWOP Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Alvarez, Javier) Result: DWOP
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
May 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Hearing Doc ID# 3
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
June 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
CitationLloyds of London Insurance Unserved
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
December 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 2
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
December 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Doc ID# 1
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.