Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Loflin, Christine N., filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by George P Andritsos, against Walgreens, Walgreen Co, represented by Clara B Burns, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Chew, Linda presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChew, Linda Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 09, 2011 |
CategoryWrongful Termination |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Case Outcome TypeDismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment Hearing CANCELED Entry of Judgment Hearing (11:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Chew, Linda) Dismissed Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
July 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Chew, Linda) Dismissed03/12/2013Reset by Court to 07/16/2013 Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
July 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
July 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Hearing CANCELED Pre-Trial Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Chew, Linda) Dismissed03/11/2013Reset by Court to 07/15/2013 Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Doc ID# 23
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
June 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Setting
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
June 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Hearing CANCELED Motion to Compel Hearing (9:45 AM) (Judicial Officer Chew, Linda) Settled Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
May 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 22
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
May 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Chew, Linda)
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
May 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Fax Doc ID# 21
Judge: Chew, Linda |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.