Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ribota, Luz Estela, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Daniela Labinoti, against Pro'S Ranch Markets, Inc., represented by William H Luck, Jr., in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Enriquez, Sergio H. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEnriquez, Sergio H. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 07, 2011 |
CategoryOther Injury Or Damage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeDismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Enriquez, Sergio H.) Non-Suit Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Final Pre-Trial Hearing CANCELED Final Pre-Trial Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Enriquez, Sergio H.) Non-Suit Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Non Suit Doc ID# 34
Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
August 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service Doc ID# 32
Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
August 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Designation of Expert Witness Doc ID# 33
Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Discovery Control Plan Doc ID# 31
Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 30
Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing (9:15 AM) (Judicial Officer Enriquez, Sergio H.)
Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 29
Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.