Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Carrete, Ofelia, Carrete, Eloy, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Steven C James, against Chase Home Finance, Llc, represented by Wm Lance Lewis, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Chew, Linda presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChew, Linda Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 07, 2011 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing CANCELED Status Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Chew, Linda) Dismissed08/23/2013Reset by Court to 09/16/201309/16/2013Reset by Court to 10/25/201310/25/2013Reset by Court to 12/02/201312/02/2013Reset by Court to 02/07/2014 Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment | |
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice Doc ID# 54 | |
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
October 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Agreed Order Doc ID# 53 | |
October 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice Doc ID# 52 | |
October 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
October 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Joint Motion Doc ID# 51 | |
October 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice Resetting Hearing Doc ID# 50 | |
September 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.