Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jaime Esparza filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case against Seven Thousand Seven Hundred Thirty Dollars And No Cents In United States, Rios, Ignacio Eduardo Omar, represented by Carmen Elena Rodriguez, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Larsen, Susan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLarsen, Susan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 06, 2011 |
CategorySeizure And Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Larsen, Susan |
|
April 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Address Doc ID# 10
Judge: Larsen, Susan |
|
April 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order for Attorney Ad Litem Fees Doc ID# 11
Judge: Larsen, Susan |
|
April 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion Doc ID# 9
Judge: Larsen, Susan |
|
April 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (10:30 AM) ()
Judge: Larsen, Susan |
|
April 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 8
Judge: Larsen, Susan |
|
March 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Answer Doc ID# 7
Judge: Larsen, Susan |
|
March 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 6
Judge: Larsen, Susan |
|
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Ad Litem Hearing (10:30 AM) ()
Judge: Larsen, Susan |
|
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem Doc ID# 5
Judge: Larsen, Susan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.