Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Maldonado, David, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Henry Aguirre, against The City Of Socorro, represented by Eric M Brittain, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Garcia, Gonzalo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGarcia, Gonzalo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 06, 2011 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Garcia, Gonzalo)
Judge: Garcia, Gonzalo |
|
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Order of Court Setting | |
February 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Order of Court Setting | |
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Garcia, Gonzalo)
Judge: Garcia, Gonzalo |
|
February 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Default Hearing CANCELED Default Hearing (10:15 AM) (Judicial Officer Garcia, Gonzalo) Court Coordinator Discretionary Cancellation Judge: Garcia, Gonzalo |
|
February 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance Doc ID# 4 | |
February 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Answer Doc ID# 3 | |
January 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Order of Court Setting | |
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event | CitationThe City Of SocorroServed12/09/2011Response Received02/02/2012Returned12/20/2011 | |
December 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) Doc ID# 1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.