Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Hernandez, Damian Michael, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 446th District Court with Billingsley, Sara K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBillingsley, Sara K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2021 |
CategoryParentage/Paternity/Voluntary Legitimation |
Last RefreshedJune 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Filing Court House446th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Entry: Notice of Dismissal Docket Hearing | |
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS ON JUNE 20, 2023 AT 9:00 AM |
|
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Designation of Counsel | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Order IN SAPCR |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
10-DAY LETTER - REQUESTS ENTRY OF ORDER IF NO OBJECTION MADE BY OPPOSING PARTY |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | TRO Hearing | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO STAY GENETIC TESTING ORDER |
|
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | INTERVENTION FILED BY OAG | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE HEARING IS SET FOR JANUARY 7, 2021 AT 8:45 A.M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.