Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mechau, Roman Coatsworth, filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case against Martinez, Viridiana Espiritu, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 446th District Court with Billingsley, Sara K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBillingsley, Sara K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 06, 2020 |
CategoryCustody Or Visitation |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Filing Court House446th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING SET FOR: JANUARY 11. 2021 AT 3:30 PM |
|
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing | |
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING PRE-TRIAL HEARING SET FOR: OCTOBER 23, 2020 AT 10:00 AM |
|
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event | TRO Hearing | |
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order EMAIL TO ATTORNEY |
|
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order and ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS IS SET FOR AUGUST 13, 2020 AT 8:45 AM |
|
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Waiver of Service | |
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Information Sheet | |
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Original SAPCR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.